+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- House voted to recommit to House Finance
- Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee continued
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee continued
On June 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance