+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2014)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2014)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary