+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (04/10/2018)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary