+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.