+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/29/2016)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/08/2016)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor