+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed as amended
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage as amended
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance