+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2016)
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2016)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources