+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/21/2018)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.