+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Corporations
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.