+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Municipal Government
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance