+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.