+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/14/2016)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations