+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/21/2018)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/07/2018)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.