+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014)
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2014)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary