+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary