+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 9, 2016 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor