+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/31/2022)
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/08/2022)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor