+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 9, 2016 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance