+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016)
On June 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary