+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations