+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/04/2014)
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2014)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor