+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
On June 18, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance