+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/25/2020)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary