+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/07/2018)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary