+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2018)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2018)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2018)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/01/2018)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources