+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary