+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
- House read and passed
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government