+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance