+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/25/2014)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary