+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2018)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/01/2018)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor