+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2014)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2014)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary