+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2022)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2022)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor