+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018)
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance