+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (02/11/2020)
- Proposed Substitute
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations