+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 12, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance