+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2014)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor