+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/09/2016)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- House read and passed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (01/21/2016)
- Committee recommends passage
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2016)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor