+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/25/2014)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House read and passed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (01/30/2014)
- Committee recommends passage
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2014)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (01/21/2014)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor