+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022)
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On June 10, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022)
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2022)
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/26/2022)
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Education
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor