+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2014)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (01/21/2014)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary