+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources