+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 21, 2017 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017)
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations