+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 19, 2013 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government