+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
- Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
- Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor