+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2015)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015)
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor