+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/03/2013)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/03/2013)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2013)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor