+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2019)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor