+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended in concurrence
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- House passed as amended
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2013)
- Committee recommends passage as amended
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013)
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary