+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2015)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2015)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/09/2015)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor