+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019)
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.